NH HB713 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 181; Eff: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 181; Eff: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation of pupils.
Title
Relative to transportation of pupils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 181; Eff: 07/01/2020 |
2019-05-14 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/25/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 122 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 27 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-02-28 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/04/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 8 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0512h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 8 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0512h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 8 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0512h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6 |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 27 |