NH HB714 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 39; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 39; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New Hampshire products purchased and sold by the liquor commission.
Title
Relative to New Hampshire products purchased and sold by the liquor commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 39; Eff: 07/14/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 80 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 22 |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 27 |