NH HB716 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation costs of certain pupils and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to transportation costs of certain pupils and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-01-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 37 |
2019-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 5 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB716 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)