NH HB717 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB717
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting prescription drug manufacturers from offering coupons or discounts to cover insurance copayments or deductibles.
Title
Prohibiting prescription drug manufacturers from offering coupons or discounts to cover insurance copayments or deductibles.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Garrett Muscatel [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 198 N: 144 NV: 23 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/09/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0932h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-144 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 81 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0932h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 81 |
2019-03-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0932h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 22 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-12 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB717 (Carry Over) 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar