NH HB718 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to instant voting in elections.
Title
Relative to instant voting in elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 10 |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 8 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 27 |