NH HB719 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the position of school nurse coordinator in the department of education and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the position of school nurse coordinator in the department of education and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Polly Campion [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 198 N: 146 NV: 25 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1447s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1447s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1447s, 04/18/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0268h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-146 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 82 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0268h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 82 |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0268h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 19 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 27 |