NH HB720 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to part time employment of retired community college system faculty.
Title
Relative to part time employment of retired community college system faculty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 31 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 27 |