NH HB723 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB723
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring a criminal history records check for applicants for teaching certification.
Title
Relative to requiring a criminal history records check for applicants for teaching certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 28 |
Same As/Similar To
HB723 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)