NH HB724 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain rights of employees.
Title
Relative to certain rights of employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] |
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Mark King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 5 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 28 |