NH HB731 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the minimum hourly rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the minimum hourly rate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-11-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2767h (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-30HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-10-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-12HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-02-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/20/2019 01:10 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback