NH HB736 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1466s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reestablishing the commission to study environmentally-triggered chronic illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reestablishing the commission to study environmentally-triggered chronic illness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1466s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1466s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1466s, 04/18/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-28Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0734h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 6
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0734h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 6
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0734h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 3
2019-02-27House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-27HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 28
2019-01-29HouseLate Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/24/2019 House Journal 3 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback