NH HB737 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 335; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2024 II. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to investigate and analyze the environmental and public health impacts relating to releases of perfluorinated chemicals in the air, soil, and groundwater in Merrimack, Bedford and Litchfield.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to investigate and analyze the environmental and public health impacts relating to releases of perfluorinated chemicals in the air, soil, and groundwater in Merrimack, Bedford and Litchfield.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 2406s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 335; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2024 II. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
2019-07-29HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2653e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-07-09SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2653e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2341s (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 11
2019-06-06SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2341s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-06-06SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-2406s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-06-06SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2341s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2341s, 06/06/2019; Senate Calendar 25
2019-05-30SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2341s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-04-10SenateHearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, State House, 08:50 am; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0991h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 35
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0991h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 35
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0991h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 13
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 28
2019-01-29HouseLate Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/24/2019 House Journal 3 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback