NH HB739 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB739
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying Medicaid spend-down requirements and requiring a report to the oversight committee on health and human services.
Title
Clarifying Medicaid spend-down requirements and requiring a report to the oversight committee on health and human services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2793h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 64 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2793h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 64 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2793h (NT) (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 18 |
2019-10-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-08-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 28 |
2019-01-29 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/24/2019 House Journal 3 P. 28 |
Same As/Similar To
HB739 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2793h (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar)