NH HB740 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 60; Eff: 06/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 60; Eff: 06/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain mortgages from the law regarding licensing of nondepository mortgage bankers, brokers, and servicers.
Title
Exempting certain mortgages from the law regarding licensing of nondepository mortgage bankers, brokers, and servicers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 60; Eff: 06/05/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0449h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0449h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0449h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 28 |
2019-01-29 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/24/2019 House Journal 3 P. 28 |