NH HB92 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB92
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-157 01/08/2019 House Journal 2 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-157 01/08/2019 House Journal 2 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the state building code and ratifying changes to the state building code adopted by the state building code review board.
Title
Revising the definition of the state building code and ratifying changes to the state building code adopted by the state building code review board.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] | Rep. Marjorie Shepardson [D] | Rep. John Mann [D] |
Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 188 N: 157 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-157 01/08/2019 House Journal 2 P. 28 |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2017-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2490h |
2017-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-10-03 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/11/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-09-27 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2017 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-02 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/23/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB92 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2490h