NH HCR5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the United States Congress to propose a constitutional amendment to reverse the ruling of the United States Supreme Court in Citizens United v. Federal Election Commission.
Title
Requesting the United States Congress to propose a constitutional amendment to reverse the ruling of the United States Supreme Court in Citizens United v. Federal Election Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 198 N: 132 NV: 32 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Table (Y: 142 N: 189 NV: 31 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - Table (Y: 142 N: 189 NV: 31 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0093h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-132 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 38 |
2019-03-14 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Hunt): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 142-189 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 38 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0093h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 37 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-02-11 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-11 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0093h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-11 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 47 |