NH HCR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applying to congress to propose a congressional term limits constitutional amendment.
Title
Applying to congress to propose a congressional term limits constitutional amendment.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] | Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] |
Rep. Peter Hayward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar) |
2019-09-17 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 24 |
Same As/Similar To
HCR6 (Carry Over) 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar)