NH HCR6 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 318-27 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 318-27 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applying to congress to propose a congressional term limits constitutional amendment.
Title
Applying to congress to propose a congressional term limits constitutional amendment.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. Peter Hayward [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] |
Rep. David Love [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 318 N: 27 NV: 27 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 318-27 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 51 |
2019-10-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 31 |
2019-09-17 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 24 |
Same As/Similar To
HCR6 (Carry Over) 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar)