NH HJR2 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the implementation of the insurance department rules regarding the New Hampshire Medical Malpractice Joint Underwriting Association.
Title
Prohibiting the implementation of the insurance department rules regarding the New Hampshire Medical Malpractice Joint Underwriting Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. David Kidder [R] |
Rep. Alida Millham [R] | Rep. Betsey Patten [R] | Rep. Maurice Pilotte [D] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/6/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-08-23 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 9/20/2011 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-13 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 176 |