NH HJR2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.676-677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.676-677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making restitution to Jeffery Frost for inappropriate prosecution.
Title
Making restitution to Jeffery Frost for inappropriate prosecution.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.676-677 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 19-0; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.419 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 208)== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.206 |