NH HJR2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation for restitution to Joseph Haas as a result of failure of the clerk of the supreme court to process a notice of errors.
Title
Making an appropriation for restitution to Joseph Haas as a result of failure of the clerk of the supreme court to process a notice of errors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/09/2017 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 4 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2017 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 23 |