NH HR7 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR7
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2705: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2705: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Condemning the use of government shutdowns.
Title
Condemning the use of government shutdowns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2705: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 53 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2705h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 53 |
2019-10-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2705h (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 14 |
2019-09-17 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-06-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/31/2019 |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced 01/31/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HR7 (Carry Over) 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2705h (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar)