NH SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Vetoed by Governor 08/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 207 N: 143 NV: 15 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 209 N: 139 NV: 17 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0998s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenateVetoed by Governor 08/09/2019
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2665e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2665e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2606c; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2606c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 207-143 06/27/2019
2019-06-20HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2606c Filed 06/13/2019; Adopt New Amendment
2019-06-19SenateConferee Change; Senator Watters Replaces Senator French; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-19Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 11:15 am, Room 101, Legislative Office Building
2019-06-19Senate==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 10:30 am, Room 101, Legislative Office Building
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Sullivan, Soucy, DiSilvestro, Bouchard 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44
2019-06-12HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Sullivan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Cavanaugh, Soucy, French; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2138h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-139 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 74
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2138h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 74
2019-05-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2138h (NT) for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 17
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/23/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/01/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-24House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0998s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0998s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0998s, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1050&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB10
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=995&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=995
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=995
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=81&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB10&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1050
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=82&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB10&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1050
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=218&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB10&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1050
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=234&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB10&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1050
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=226&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB10&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1050

Bill Comments

feedback