NH SB100 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 06/14/2011; Chapter 0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 06/14/2011; Chapter 0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the size limitations on OHRVs operating in Jericho Mountain state park.
Title
Relative to the size limitations on OHRVs operating in Jericho Mountain state park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 06/14/2011; Chapter 0184 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Odell Concurs with House Amendment #1683h; New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1683h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1537 | |
2011-05-18 | House Amendment #1683h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1537 | |
2011-05-12 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1683h (New Title); House Calendar 39, PG.1345 | |
2011-05-12 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1683h(NT) for May 18 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1322 | |
2011-05-04 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-04-27 | House =CANCELLED= Executive Session: 5/3/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-04-20 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/26/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0993s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.172 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0993s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.172 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0993s, New Title, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.35 |