NH SB100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Vetoed by Governor 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to discrimination in employment based on criminal background checks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to discrimination in employment based on criminal background checks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 217 N: 130 NV: 31 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateVetoed by Governor 07/19/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1760h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-130 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 40
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1760h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 40
2019-05-06HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-06HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1760h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 11
2019-04-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 05/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Kahn Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1167s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1167s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1167s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=981&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB100
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=992&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=992
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=992
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=102&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0100&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB100&ddlsponsors=&lsr=981
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=208&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0100&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB100&ddlsponsors=&lsr=981
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=213&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0100&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB100&ddlsponsors=&lsr=981

Bill Comments

feedback