NH SB101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 301
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to procedures for county audits and recodifying provisions for performance and forensic audits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to procedures for county audits and recodifying provisions for performance and forensic audits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-24HousePublic Hearing: 04/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1048s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1048s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1048s, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback