NH SB103 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 231; Effective 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 231; Effective 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing municipalities to engage in multi-town bonding projects.
Title
Authorizing municipalities to engage in multi-town bonding projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. Wayne Moynihan [D] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] |
Rep. Craig Thompson [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 231; Effective 09/10/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Levesque Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1799h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment # 2019-1799h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 21 |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1799h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 8 |
2019-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing: 04/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |