NH SB104 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 192; Effective 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 192; Effective 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the postponement of city, town, village, and school district elections.
Title
Relative to the postponement of city, town, village, and school district elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 192; Effective 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2412e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2412e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 82 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 13 |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 4 |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1186s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1186s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1186s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |