NH SB105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to contributions to inaugural committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to contributions to inaugural committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-09House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0886s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2019-0886s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-24SenateHearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback