NH SB107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to extended foster care under the child protection act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to extended foster care under the child protection act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback