NH SB116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to an assistance program for grandparents caring for minor children and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to an assistance program for grandparents caring for minor children and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1145s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1145s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1145s, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-13SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback