NH SB119 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directing hospitals to develop an operational plan for the care of patients with dementia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing hospitals to develop an operational plan for the care of patients with dementia.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 19-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 5
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced 03/14/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 9 P. 53
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0738s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-0738s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0610s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0610s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-14SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback