NH SB12 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Law Without Signature 08/03/2019; Chapter 317; Effective 07/01/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Law Without Signature 08/03/2019; Chapter 317; Effective 07/01/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire college graduate retention incentive partnership program and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire college graduate retention incentive partnership program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 201 N: 134 NV: 35 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Senate | Law Without Signature 08/03/2019; Chapter 317; Effective 07/01/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1634h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-134 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 80 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1634h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 80 |
2019-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1634h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 16 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Special Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |