NH SB128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB128
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the policy goal of electric utility restructuring.
Title
Relative to the policy goal of electric utility restructuring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 21 |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2018-01-09 | House | Special Order to next session day Without Objection House Journal 2 P. 47 |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2017-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-18 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment # 2017-2457h: 10/25/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-10-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-09-28 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-07-31 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-05-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/09/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-05-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-04-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/02/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-04-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/02/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1175s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2017-1175s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-0883s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0883s, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 128 to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 128 to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0883s, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am, on proposed amendment # 2017-0426s; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB128 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar)