NH SB128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 236; Effective 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the court accreditation commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the court accreditation commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 236; Effective 09/10/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1568h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 10
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1568h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 10
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1568h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 6
2019-04-23HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-06SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback