NH SB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Law Without Signature 06/08/2019; Chapter 0072; Effective 06/08/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Law Without Signature 06/08/2019; Chapter 0072; Effective 06/08/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study options for lowering student debt.
Title
Establishing a committee to study options for lowering student debt.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Rep. Megan Murray [D] |
Rep. David Luneau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - OTP (Y: 217 N: 142 NV: 18 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Law Without Signature 06/08/2019; Chapter 0072; Effective 06/08/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-142 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 12 |
2019-04-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-04-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 8 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0310s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0310s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0310s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |