NH SB14 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - IV. Remainder Effective 08/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to child welfare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to child welfare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateIV. Remainder Effective 08/02/2019
2019-06-04SenateIII. Section 5 Effective 06/03/2019
2019-06-04SenateII. RSA 170-G:4-d, inserted by section 16, shall take effect 01/01/2020
2019-06-04SenateI. RSA 170-G:4-b, inserted by section 16, shall take effect 07/01/2020
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/03/2019; Chapter 0044
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-15SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1685h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 13
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1685h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 13
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1685h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 8
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-26House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/09/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-26House==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0930s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-0930s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11
2019-02-07SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback