NH SB145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 145 Become Law: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 145 Become Law: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the organization of alternative treatment centers.
Title
Relative to the organization of alternative treatment centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1004s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1004s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 145 Become Law: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 06/25/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2061e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); |
2019-05-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2061e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 102 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 67 |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 14 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/25/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1004s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1004s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1004s, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |