NH SB15 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making an appropriation to the affordable housing fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making an appropriation to the affordable housing fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseRetained in Committee
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 05/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-04-24HouseDivision I Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-04-08HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Finance House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-31SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback