NH SB15 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB15
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the affordable housing fund.
Title
Making an appropriation to the affordable housing fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 46 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 10 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-05-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-04-24 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-04-08 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Finance House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB15 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)