NH SB150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Title
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Sponsors
Sen. David Starr [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |