NH SB154 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1577h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 250-89 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study tax incentives for promoting development of dense workforce housing in community centers, and authorizing the sale of certain property by the town of Milton.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study tax incentives for promoting development of dense workforce housing in community centers, and authorizing the sale of certain property by the town of Milton.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1577h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 250-89 05/23/2019
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1577h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-10HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-10HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1577h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 11
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1198s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1198s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1198s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback