NH SB156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 156 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 156 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political contributions made by limited liability companies.
Title
Relative to political contributions made by limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 156 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 212-139 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 57 |
2019-05-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 13 |
2019-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |