NH SB158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to town and city membership in a nonprofit, nonpartisan organization and prohibiting recipients of municipal or county funds from using such funds for lobbying.
Title
Relative to town and city membership in a nonprofit, nonpartisan organization and prohibiting recipients of municipal or county funds from using such funds for lobbying.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB158 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar