NH SB159 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB159
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 207-130 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 207-130 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to net energy metering limits for customer-generators.
Title
Relative to net energy metering limits for customer-generators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 207 N: 130 NV: 18 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 227 N: 128 NV: 18 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 227 N: 128 NV: 18 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 207-130 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 159 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 02/10/2020 |
2020-02-03 | House | Enrolled 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 60 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 01/30/2020); Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2844h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 227-128 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 45 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2019-2844h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 45 |
2019-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2844h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 30 |
2019-11-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/06/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-10-21 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-06-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1174s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1174s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1174s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 08:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB159 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate