NH SB161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of pet vendor, the transfer of animals, and establishing the position of accounting clerk in the department of agriculture, markets, and food.
Title
Relative to the definition of pet vendor, the transfer of animals, and establishing the position of accounting clerk in the department of agriculture, markets, and food.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Reconsider SB 161: the motion to Lay on the Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Without Objection, Sen. Feltes Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0657s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0657s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0657s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |