NH SB164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 238; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 238; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study unprotected drinking water sources.
Title
Establishing a committee to study unprotected drinking water sources.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] |
Rep. Reed Panasiti [R] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 238; Effective 07/12/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1743h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 18 |
2019-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2019-1743h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 18 |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1743h (NT) for 05/23/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 6 |
2019-04-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/08/2019 12:15 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-16 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0653s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0653s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0653s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |