NH SB174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 9Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 9Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal parking surcharges and parking maintenance and operations.
Title
Relative to municipal parking surcharges and parking maintenance and operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. George Sykes [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Remove from the Table (Y: 9 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 9Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 03/09/2017 Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0646s, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment #2017-0646s, Division Vote 12Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 174 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |