NH SB174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proclaiming an annual observance of Juneteenth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming an annual observance of Juneteenth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-04-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 15
2019-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/02/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11
2019-02-06Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback