NH SB176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 272; Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 272; Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study mental health and human service business process alignment and information system interoperability.
Title
Establishing a committee to study mental health and human service business process alignment and information system interoperability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 272; Effective 07/19/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 20 |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 7 |
2019-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-05-08 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-05-08 | House | Public Hearing: 05/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1472h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1472h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1472h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 3 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0635s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0635s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0635s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/29/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |